CT SB00233 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - File Number 588
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - File Number 588
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To mitigate financial hardships to nursing homes caused by delays in Medicaid eligibility determinations.
Title
An Act Concerning Advance Payments To Nursing Facilities For Uncompensated Care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | File Number 588 | |
2012-04-24 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-24 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-24 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-18 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-04-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-13 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-04-10 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-27 | File Number 120 | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Calendar Number 121 | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-03-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-20 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-13 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-02-24 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |