CT SB00234 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Banks
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Banks
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify certain powers of Connecticut banks.
Title
An Act Concerning Connecticut Banks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Banks |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-28 | Senate | File Number 243 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 200 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |