CT SB00246 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - File Number 118
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - File Number 118
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a maximum rate, not to exceed two hundred per cent of the state's median hourly wage for nursing personnel, for temporary nursing services provided by a temporary nursing services agency to a nursing home facility.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Temporary Nursing Services Provided To Nursing Home Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | File Number 118 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 107 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |