CT SB00252 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - File Number 482
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - File Number 482
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) implement federal court rulings regarding independent expenditure political committees and contributions to such committees, (2) reflect federal case law on aggregate contribution limits for individuals, (3) more explicitly recognize referendum spending as a type of independent expenditure and make changes related to reporting and attribution requirements, (4) adjust a disclaimer requirement to address certain organization expenditures, (5) make a conforming change regarding the distribution of surplus funds by candidate committees participating in the Citizens' Election Program, (6) allow the State Elections Enforcement Commission additional time to investigate certain complaints, (7) establish in-state contributor requirements for state-wide candidates participating in said program, (8) specify that individual contributions under said program may not exceed already-established contribution limits, and (9) provide for increased disclosure with respect to moneys paid to campaign consultants.
Title
An Act Concerning Referenda, Independent Expenditures And Other Campaign Finance Changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | File Number 482 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 276 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |