CT SB00257 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Calendar Number 391
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Calendar Number 391
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) specify that the Secretary of the State is the state executive for purposes of certifying presidential electors under the federal Electoral Count Reform Act of 2022, and (2) move later by one day the required meeting of the presidential electors.
Title
An Act Concerning Certification Of And Casting Of Ballots By Presidential Electors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 89 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 391 |
2024-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | File Number 177 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 142 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |