CT SB00272 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Calendar Number 424
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Calendar Number 424
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To adopt the Connecticut Uniform Trust Decanting Act.
Title
An Act Concerning Adoption Of The Connecticut Uniform Trust Decanting Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 111 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House Calendar Number 424 |
2024-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4312 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | File Number 503 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 291 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |