CT SB00278 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 294
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 294
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require a quarterly report, public hearings and the posting of information on the Internet web site of the Department of Transportation regarding the receipt and expenditure of funds received pursuant to the Infrastructure Investment and Jobs Act, P.L. 117-58.
Title
An Act Concerning Transparency Related To Federal Funds Received By The Department Of Transportation For Capital Projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | File Number 294 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 205 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |