CT SB00287 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 213
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 213
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) extend the reporting date of the indoor air quality within school buildings task force; (2) allow the cost of performing the uniform inspection and evaluation of HVAC systems to be a reimbursable cost under the heating, ventilation and air conditioning system grant program; and (3) provide boards of education flexibility when it comes to performing such uniform inspection and evaluations.
Title
An Act Concerning Indoor Air Quality In Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | File Number 213 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 159 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |