CT SB00293 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Calendar Number 422
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Calendar Number 422
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require a waste characterization study and needs assessment and increase certain transportation weight limits for vehicles hauling solid waste.
Title
An Act Concerning Municipal Solid Waste Management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 122 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House Calendar Number 422 |
2024-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4243 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | File Number 307 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 209 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |