CT SB00294 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Calendar Number 396
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Calendar Number 396
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify and strengthen the provision of the general statutes requiring municipalities that take, convert or repurpose park lands to provide comparable replacement land.
Title
An Act Concerning The Taking Of Municipal Park Lands By Municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 80 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 396 |
2024-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | File Number 252 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 178 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |