CT SB00307 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Calendar Number 397
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Calendar Number 397
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To improve outcomes for Medicaid enrollees afflicted with cancer and other diseases by utilizing biomarker testing to help guide treatment.
Title
An Act Concerning Medicaid Coverage Of Biomarker Testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 82 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 397 |
2024-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3931 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | File Number 317 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 211 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |