CT SB00339 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require restitution to the law enforcement unit, entity or individual that owns a police animal or dog in a volunteer canine search and rescue team when such animal or dog is injured or killed.
Title
An Act Requiring Restitution When A Police Animal Or Dog In A Volunteer Canine Search And Rescue Team Is Injured Or Killed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-23 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-03 | Senate | File Number 217 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 163 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |