CT SB00350 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide greater access to the Connecticut Television Network.
Title
An Act Concerning Satellite Television.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-04-01 | File Number 255 | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Calendar Number 178 | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-01 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-26 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-16 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-02-26 | Public Hearing 03/04 | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |