CT SB00350 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - File Number 504
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - File Number 504
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Correction to report to the General Assembly on the use of body scanning machines in the public entrance areas of correctional facilities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Body Scanning Machines In The Public Entrance Areas Of Correctional Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | File Number 504 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 292 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |