CT SB00367 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow an active member of the armed forces to obtain the special license plate for veterans.
Title
An Act Concerning Motor Vehicle Number Plates For Active Members Of The Armed Forces.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 274 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 91 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 91 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-16 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-14 | Public Act 11-56 | |
2011-06-04 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-04 | House Passed | |
2011-04-28 | House Calendar Number 392 | |
2011-04-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-27 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Passed | |
2011-04-06 | File Number 417 | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Calendar Number 252 | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-06 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-21 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-18 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-03-11 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-03-10 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-08 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-08 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Transportation | |
2011-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs | |
2011-02-04 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-01-28 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |