CT SB00374 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - File Number 549
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - File Number 549
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To equalize pay between workers who provide services through a nonprofit provider for clients of the Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services and workers who provide services for the same nonprofit provider for clients of the Department of Developmental Services.
Title
An Act Concerning Equalizing Rates Of Pay For Nonprofit Provider Workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | File Number 549 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 323 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/26 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |