CT SB00377 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-10-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-10-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide municipalities with the option of waiving the interest accrued on any property tax if such interest is owed by a member of the armed forces who was on active duty outside of Connecticut at the time such tax was due and such interest accrued.
Title
An Act Concerning Interest Owed On Property Taxes By Members Of The Armed Forces Called To Active Service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 331 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 179 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 179 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-16 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-14 | Public Act 11-62 | |
2011-06-07 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-07 | House Passed | |
2011-05-16 | House Calendar Number 526 | |
2011-05-16 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-12 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Senate Passed | |
2011-05-10 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-10 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |
2011-05-10 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-09 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-09 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-05 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |
2011-04-26 | File Number 628 | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Calendar Number 384 | |
2011-04-26 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-18 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-04-07 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-07 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-03-11 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-03-10 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-08 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-08 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-03-04 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs | |
2011-03-03 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-02-03 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |
2011-01-28 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |