CT SB00377 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - House Calendar Number 430
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - House Calendar Number 430
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the time period within which an insured shall: (1) Provide notice of the birth of a newborn, and (2) pay any required premium or subscription fee to continue the newborn's coverage beyond that period.
Title
An Act Concerning Health Insurance Coverage For Newborns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 127 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Joint Favorable) (Y: 5 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Joint Favorable) (Y: 5 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 430 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | File Number 358 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 256 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |