CT SB00393 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - File Number 431
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - File Number 431
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Treasurer's recommendations for changes to the process for claiming unclaimed property, including by adding provisions concerning virtual currency, updating contact methods to include electronic means, requiring executors and administrators to search for unclaimed property prior to finalizing an estate through probate, adding requirements for paid finders of unclaimed property and requiring the Commissioner of Revenue Services to agree to provide certain information to the Treasurer.
Title
An Act Implementing The Treasurer's Recommendations Concerning Unclaimed Property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | File Number 431 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 267 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |