CT SB00425 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Motion Failed MF
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Motion Failed MF
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide that a member of a municipal board shall not have his or her term of office terminated because of an ordinance changing the number of members serving on such board and to authorize towns to provide for nonpartisan boards of education.
Title
An Act Concerning Nonpartisan Membership On Boards Of Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Motion Failed MF | |
2010-04-21 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education | |
2010-04-12 | File Number 477 | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Calendar Number 325 | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-12 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-22 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-08 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |
2010-03-05 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |