CT SB00431 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - File Number 396
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - File Number 396
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize a public agency to charge a redaction fee for the disclosure of a record created by police body-worn equipment or dashboard cameras that contains portions not authorized to be disclosed under state or federal law.
Title
An Act Concerning Fees For Copying, Reviewing And Redacting Records Created By Police Body-worn Recording Equipment And Dashboard Cameras.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | File Number 396 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 258 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |