CT SB00435 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - File Number 484
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - File Number 484
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To amend the definition of funeral directing and to make changes to requirements concerning disclosure of costs relating to funeral services.
Title
An Act Concerning The Definition Of Funeral Directing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | File Number 484 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 313 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |