CT SB00435 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To provide a tax credit for employers that make education loan payments for employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Tax Credit For Employers Making Education Loan Payments For Employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-04-01SenateFile Number 263
2019-04-01SenateSenate Calendar Number 144
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-01SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-15SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22SenatePublic Hearing 02/28
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-02-20SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-24SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback