CT SB00436 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - File Number 471
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - File Number 471
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the prohibition against disclosing the residential address of certain persons contained in personnel, medical or similar files by deleting reference to the employing public agency and expanding the prohibition to certain other employees where residency is not a requirement for employment.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To The Freedom Of Information Act Concerning The Nondisclosure Of The Addresses Of Certain Public Agency Employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | File Number 471 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 283 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |