CT SB00438 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To remove fiscal restrictions that limit the State Board of Education's ability to grant charters to local and state charter schools; to eliminate the enrollment cap of eighty-five students per grade for state charter schools that have demonstrated a record of achievement; to extend the Commissioner of Education's authority to provide grants to state charter schools for capital expenses; and to increase the per pupil grant to districts receiving open choice program students.
Title
An Act Concerning Education Reform In Connecticut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 365 PASS AS AMND BY SEN A, HOU A (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 245 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 244 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 4634 (Y: 10 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 245 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 244 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 4634 (Y: 10 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-24 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-18 | Public Act 10-111 | |
2010-05-05 | In Concurrence | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-05 | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate | |
2010-05-04 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2010-05-04 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-04 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-04 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 5151 | |
2010-05-04 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5548 | |
2010-05-04 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-04-30 | House Calendar Number 474 | |
2010-04-30 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-30 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 4634 | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4726 | |
2010-04-19 | File Number 593 | |
2010-04-19 | Senate Calendar Number 422 | |
2010-04-19 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-19 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-12 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-04-01 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-04-01 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-24 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | |
2010-03-11 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |