CT SB00452 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - House Calendar Number 657
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a State Oversight Council on Children and Families in place of the State Advisory Council on Children and Families, and require the State Oversight Council on Children and Families to report annually to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to appropriations and children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing The Child Welfare And Policy Oversight Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 199 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateHouse Calendar Number 657
2019-05-24SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-23SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-23SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8341
2019-03-28SenateFile Number 215
2019-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 111
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-25SenatePublic Hearing 03/05
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Children
2019-02-21SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-05SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback