CT SB00455 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-25 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-25 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) clarify the responsibilities and duties of the individual commissioners and staff of the Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities, (2) extend certain statutory protections against discrimination to veterans and members of the armed forces and (3) require municipalities to comply with set-aside requirements for municipal projects funded by the state.
Title
An Act Concerning The Commission On Human Rights And Opportunities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-19 | File Number 534 | |
2012-04-19 | Senate Calendar Number 383 | |
2012-04-19 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-19 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-13 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-04-02 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-02 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-23 | Public Hearing 03/29 | |
2012-03-21 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |