CT SB00459 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - File Number 580
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - File Number 580
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To convey a parcel of state land in the city of Bridgeport in accordance with a 2001 lease agreement.
Title
An Act Concerning A Conveyance Of A Parcel Of State Land In The City Of Bridgeport.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | File Number 580 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 359 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/24 12:00 PM |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/09 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |