CT SB00502 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To convey various parcels of state land and release certain restrictions concerning previously conveyed state land.
Title
An Act Concerning The Conveyance Of Certain Parcels Of State Land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 332 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 304 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 304 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-25 | House | Public Act 18-154 |
2018-05-09 | House | In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | House | Rules Suspended |
2018-05-09 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5977 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | File Number 488 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 293 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |