CT SB00504 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Conveying Certain Parcels Of State Land.
Title
An Act Conveying Certain Parcels Of State Land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 305 EMERGENCY CERTIFI (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 433 PASS EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 438 PASS EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 433 PASS EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 438 PASS EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-26 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-26 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-25 | House | Public Act 16-1 |
2016-05-13 | House | In Concurrence |
2016-05-13 | House | House Passed |
2016-05-12 | House | Immediate Transmittal to the House |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Emergency Certification |