CT SB00507 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Public Hearing 03/06
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Public Hearing 03/06
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize certified foresters to serve as tree wardens and not have to complete certain tree warden coursework if their training and experience otherwise includes knowledge of such coursework's information.
Title
An Act Authorizing Certified Foresters To Serve As Tree Wardens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |