CT SB00521 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To permit the respective municipal appointing authorities for Middletown Area Transit to remove directors prior to the expiration of such directors' terms.
Title
An Act Concerning Middletown Area Transit.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Sen. Matthew Lesser [D] | Sen. Mary Daugherty Abrams [D] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Rep. Quentin Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 121 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | Bill Passed Temporarily |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House Calendar Number 563 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | File Number 714 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 346 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |