CT SB00556 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To permit any municipality, by a two-thirds vote of its legislative body, to annually pay a retired public safety employee who suffered serious and permanent bodily injury in the line of duty and who retired as a result thereof, up to the age of sixty-five, the difference between such employee's disability pay and such employee's regular rate of pay prior to retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Additional Compensation For Certain Retired Public Safety Employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 329 SENATE AMD A (Y: 96 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 330 AS AMENDED (Y: 116 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 133 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-20SenatePublic Act 19-111
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-13SenateHouse Calendar Number 574
2019-05-13SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-10SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-10SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-10SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7552
2019-04-17SenateFile Number 717
2019-04-17SenateSenate Calendar Number 349
2019-04-17SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
2019-03-27SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-03-08SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-22SenatePublic Hearing 02/27
2019-01-30SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00556&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00556-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00556-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00556-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00111-R00SB-00556-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00556-R00PD-CV19-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00556-R00PD-CV114-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00556-R00PD-CV154-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00133-R00SB00556-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00330-R00SB00556-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00329-R00SB00556-HV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback