CT SB00588 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - House Calendar Number 691
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To minimize adverse environmental and tourism impacts from off-shore oil and gas drilling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Prohibiting Off-shore Drilling For Oil And Gas In Connecticut.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 264 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-01SenateHouse Calendar Number 691
2019-06-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-30SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-30SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-30SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8000
2019-04-15SenateFile Number 659
2019-04-15SenateSenate Calendar Number 318
2019-04-15SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-15SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-28SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-13SenatePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-03-12SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2019-03-11SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-11SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback