CT SB00815 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - File Number 157
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - File Number 157
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To redefine "administrative expense" for purposes of certain bond financed housing programs and to make minor revisions to the statute concerning the homelessness prevention response fund.
Title
An Act Making Minor Revisions To Statutes Regarding Bond-financed Housing Programs And The Homelessness Prevention And Response Fund And Requiring Legislative Approval Of Qualified Allocation Plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Senate | File Number 157 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 114 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |