CT SB00823 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the foreclosure mediation program until June 30, 2023.
Title
An Act Extending The Foreclosure Mediation Program Until June 30, 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-08 | Senate | File Number 520 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 239 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |