CT SB00848 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Department of Banking's recommended changes to the banking statutes concerning financial institutions.
Title
An Act Implementing The Department Of Banking's Recommended Changes To The Banking Statutes Concerning Financial Institutions And Consumer Credit Licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 389 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 181 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 181 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Public Act 21-138 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Passed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 489 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-13 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-03-24 | Senate | File Number 127 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 127 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |