CT SB00854 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) require guidance counselors and school counselors to provide materials concerning manufacturing, military and law enforcement careers to students; (2) require local and regional school district boards of education to develop goals for career placement for students choosing not to pursue an advanced degree; (3) include manufacturing employment and certificate program rates in the accountability index; and (4) establish a task force to study demand for career and technical education teachers in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Promoting Careers In Manufacturing To Public School Students And Establishing A Task Force To Study The Demand For Career And Technical Education Teachers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 316 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 99 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-13SenatePublic Act 19-58
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-10SenateHouse Calendar Number 557
2019-05-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-08SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-08SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-08SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7973
2019-04-01SenateFile Number 258
2019-04-01SenateSenate Calendar Number 142
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-01SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-15SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-15SenatePublic Hearing 02/21
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback