CT SB00861 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To exempt veterans from the registration and administration fees for medical marijuana.
Title
An Act Waiving Certain Medical Marijuana Fees For Veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-03-31 | Senate | File Number 233 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 172 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |