CT SB00863 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit certain factors from being used to underwrite or rate a private passenger nonfleet automobile insurance policy.
Title
An Act Concerning Factors Used In Automobile Insurance Rating.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-05 | Senate | File Number 21 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 61 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/13 5:00 PM |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |