CT SB00870 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To revise the higher education and employment advancement statutes.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 301 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 225 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 225 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Public Act 17-63 |
2017-06-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House Calendar Number 599 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7678 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | File Number 371 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 198 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |