CT SB00927 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To protect students by preventing the use of physical restraint or seclusion for anything other than emergency situations and to include the topics of restraint, seclusion and other deescalation techniques as a part of in-service training for teachers.
Title
An Act Concerning Seclusion And Restraint In Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 308 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 276 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN B (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 276 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN B (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Public Act 15-141 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-01 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2015-06-01 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2015-06-01 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House Calendar Number 653 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8304 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-14 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Education |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6945 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | File Number 72 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 96 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/15 5:00 PM |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |