CT SB00928 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require a study of issues concerning teacher preparation and training requirements and alternative routes to certification in early childhood education.
Title
An Act Concerning Teacher Preparation And Alternate Routes To Certification In Early Childhood Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Berger [D] | House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Rep. Geoffrey Luxenberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education | |
2011-03-18 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-15 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Education | |
2011-02-10 | Public Hearing 02/17 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |