CT SB00932 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To make revisions to and extend the dates of the staff qualifications requirement for early childhood educators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Staff Qualifications Requirement For Early Childhood Educators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 316 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 51 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-12SenatePublic Act 19-34
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed
2019-04-18SenateHouse Calendar Number 471
2019-04-18SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-17SenateSenate Passed
2019-04-02SenateFile Number 323
2019-04-02SenateSenate Calendar Number 149
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-02SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-15SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01SenatePublic Hearing 03/06
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback