CT SB00943 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To streamline the state economic strategic plan in order to make it more customer-friendly, clear and focused.
Title
An Act Concerning Changes To The State Economic Strategic Plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Commerce |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-20 | Senate | File Number 71 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 117 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |