CT SB00951 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - House Calendar Number 544
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - House Calendar Number 544
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide that (1) a person who is subject to a conservatorship proceeding or a proceeding concerning administration of treatment for a psychiatric disability shall not be appointed a guardian ad litem prior to a determination that such person is incapacitated, and (2) such appointment be made for limited purposes and duration established by the court.
Title
An Act Concerning The Appointment Of A Guardian Ad Litem For A Person Who Is Subject To A Conservatorship Proceeding Or A Proceeding Concerning Administration Of Treatment For A Psychiatric Disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 207 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | House Calendar Number 544 | |
2011-05-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-20 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Senate Passed | |
2011-04-20 | File Number 604 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Calendar Number 373 | |
2011-04-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-06 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-05 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-24 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |