CT SB00978 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To exempt certain employees of the Technical Education and Career System from mandatory health contributions to the Teachers' Retirement System.
Title
An Act Concerning Teachers' Retirement System Contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 320 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 273 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 273 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Public Act 19-73 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-01 | Senate | House Calendar Number 697 |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-30 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9494 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-04-02 | Senate | File Number 328 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 172 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |