CT SB01019 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To implement the intensive reading instruction program state wide and expand such program to include grades four and five; to establish the Center for Literacy Research and Reading Success within the Neag School of Education at The University of Connecticut; and to require students to be proficient in reading at the end of grade three.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning School Literacy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25SenateJoint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
2019-03-08SenatePublic Hearing 03/13
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback