CT SB01024 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish reimbursement for emergency room physicians who are enrolled as Medicaid providers and provide professional services to Medicaid patients in a hospital emergency room.
Title
An Act Concerning Reimbursement Of Emergency Room Physicians For Treatment Of Medicaid Recipients.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |