CT SB01029 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-28 - File Number 246
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-28 - File Number 246
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make technical revisions to the education and early childhood statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Legislative Commissioners' Recommendations For Technical Revisions To The Education And Early Childhood Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-10 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Senate | File Number 246 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 171 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |